Trustees NUFFIELD COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1137506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

36 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir ANDREW DILNOT Chair 26 October 2012
None on record
Dr Tarik Abou-Chadi Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Professor Martin Weidner Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Professor Barbara Petrongolo Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
PROFESSOR FRANK WINDMEIJER Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
PROFESSOR LUCIE CLUVER Trustee 01 September 2019
AIDS IMPACT
Received: On time
Professor Andrew Thompson Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Prof Hamish Low Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Prof Pepper Culpepper Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Prof Jane Green Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Dr JANINA DILL Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
RIDHI KASHYAP Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Professor Cecile Laborde FBA Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
THOMAS MOORE Trustee 02 October 2015
None on record
PROF STEPHEN BROADBERRY Trustee 01 September 2015
ECONOMIC HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
PROF DAVID KIRK Trustee 15 August 2015
None on record
PROF RICHARD BREEN Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record
PROF EZEQUIEL GONZALEZ OCANTOS Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Professor Melinda Catherine Mills Trustee 09 June 2014
None on record
Professor Martin Ellison Trustee 08 June 2014
None on record
Prof Ian Anderson Crawford Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
Dr ELENI KECHAGIA-OVSEIKO Trustee 16 September 2013
None on record
Prof Benjamin William Ansell Trustee 01 July 2013
None on record
Prof Francisco David Rueda Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR JANNE JONSSON Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
Dr ERZSEBET BUKODI Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
Dr CHRISTIAAN MONDEN Trustee
None on record
PROF COLIN MILLS Trustee
None on record
PROF IAN JEWITT Trustee
None on record
Dr MARGARET MEYER Trustee
None on record
PROF NAN DIRK DE GRAAF Trustee
None on record
Dr STEPHEN BOND Trustee
None on record
PROF GEOFFREY EVANS Trustee
None on record
PROF DESMOND KING Trustee
None on record
PROF PAUL KLEMPERER Trustee
None on record
DR BENT NIELSEN Trustee
None on record