Financial history THE LEVENFICHE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1099968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £12.08k £13.34k £13.15k £18.32k £27.26k
Total expenditure £12.43k £12.47k £13.17k £11.57k £32.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A