FRIENDS OF HARDWICK PRIMARY (FOHPS)

Charity number: 1097749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2021 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 04 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required