FRIENDS OF HARDWICK PRIMARY (FOHPS)

Charity number: 1097749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £9.89k £9.81k £4.55k £6.10k £1.86k
Total expenditure £4.86k £5.12k £5.70k £3.53k £4.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A