THE TAVISTOCK MUSEUM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1098266
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER JOHN HURDWELL Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
BARBARA WATSON Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
MRS PAT WARNE Trustee None on record
SUSAN JULIA DAVIES Trustee None on record
STEPHEN JAMES BALL Trustee 18 April 2019 None on record
RODERICK MALCOLM JOHN MARTIN Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
THOMAS FRANCIS EDWARD YOUNG Chair None on record
LINDA ELLIOTT Trustee 24 June 2012 None on record
PAUL CROUCHER Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record