Accounts and annual returns ST MARIES PARENTS TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 September 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2021 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required