Trustees ST AUGUSTINE'S PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 1097781

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick D'Arcy | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Job | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Beeston | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sparks | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bowler | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Marino | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Davies | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Benedict Cassidy | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Copeland | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Floyd Steadman | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.