GOJAM DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION IN BRITAIN (GDAIB)

Charity number: 1097589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 March 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 February 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required