Financial history ST AUSTELL BREWERY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1105828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £66.45k £82.50k £79.94k £43.55k £5.97k
Total expenditure £84.47k £71.57k £78.67k £40.66k £45.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A