Financial history COUNCIL FOR WORLD MISSION (UK)

Charity number: 1097842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.09m £4.19m £3.52m £3.63m £4.09m
Total expenditure £12.55m £7.50m £9.73m £5.70m £6.41m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £139.34k £126.91k £114.29k £96.72k £98.61k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.90m £4.06m £3.40m £3.53m £3.99m
Income - Other £53.33k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £49.16k £29.45k £32.47k £18 £5.82k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.43m £6.41m £8.48m £4.46m £4.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.13m £1.09m £1.26m £1.24m £1.94m
Expenditure - Governance £19.82k £29.44k £26.83k £35.61k £23.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.97m £6.09m £8.08m £4.06m £3.90m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.13m £1.09m £1.26m £1.24m £1.94m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0