Dogfen lywodraethu THE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE UTTLESFORD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF UTTLESFORD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF UTTLESFORD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.