Dogfen lywodraethu HEATHFIELD EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 JUN 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 2. PROMOTING THE PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHILDREN UNDER FIVE ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORCESTERSHIRE AND WEST MIDLANDS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.