Governance THE AIR AMBULANCE SERVICE
Charity number: 1098874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 05 August 2003: Standard registration
- 13 October 2020: Funds received from 1175307 NUNEATON COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE
- 23 August 2021: Funds received from 1071587 THE ROTARY CLUB OF COVENTRY BREAKFAST CHARITABLE T...
- 17 February 2022: Funds received from 1180509 CHILDREN ARE BUTTERFLIES LTD
- 20 October 2022: Funds received from 1107971 FRIENDS OF BELARUS
- 09 February 2023: Funds received from 1065011 MARKET BOSWORTH AGRICULTURAL HORTICULTURAL AND EQU...
- 28 March 2023: Funds received from 1169338 THE WORLDWINGS CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- DERBYSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND AIR AMBULANCE (Working name)
- WARWICKSHIRE AND NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AIR AMBULANCE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Care Quality Commission
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.