ST. BONAVENTURE'S SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1098168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.28k £10.86k £8.99k £14.86k £13.74k
Total expenditure £13.55k £33.27k £12.94k £12.20k £17.81k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A