MIDLANDS & BRISTOL REFUGEE HOUSING LIMITED

Charity number: 1100293
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2008 30/04/2009 30/04/2010 30/04/2011 30/04/2012
Total gross income £8.65k £9.28k £8.64k £2.94k £4.82k
Total expenditure £8.48k £8.98k £8.42k £2.81k £4.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A