CELEBRATING SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1099536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 December 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 December 2020 38 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 December 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 December 2019 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 November 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required