CELEBRATING SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1099536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.47k £10.69k £69.00k £85.65k £99.29k
Total expenditure £38.78k £9.03k £61.44k £92.80k £50.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.73k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £80.27k £10.73k