TRUSTEES OF ST ANDREW'S COMMUNITY HALL CHARMOUTH

Charity number: 1099177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required