TRUSTEES OF ST ANDREW'S COMMUNITY HALL CHARMOUTH

Charity number: 1099177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.57k £14.90k £10.33k £11.60k £10.33k
Total expenditure £19.43k £14.64k £7.64k £4.12k £8.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A