BALLET BLACK

Charity number: 1101599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heidi Ann Hall Trustee 02 December 2015
CENTRAL SCHOOL OF BALLET CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
AKINTUNDE BANJOKO OBE Trustee 04 July 2019
LANRE JOHNSON CHARITY Received: On time
PATRICIA HAMZAHEE Trustee 04 July 2019
FRIENDS OF INTERNATIONAL HOUSE NEW YORK CITY TRUST Received: On time
PIONEER THEATRES LIMITED Received: On time
Christopher Hampson Trustee 07 July 2018
CENTRAL SCHOOL OF BALLET CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Anna Prag Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Ms Lela Kogbara Trustee 10 September 2018
DFN PROJECT SEARCH Received: On time
Tonye Vianana Trustee 08 November 2021 None on record
Cassa Pancho MBE Trustee 07 November 2002 None on record
Andrew Hochhauser Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Althea Efunshile CBE Trustee 09 July 2018 None on record