INSPIRE AT ST PETER'S

Charity number: 1106693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £632.80k £777.89k £619.29k £567.64k £432.29k
Total expenditure £605.93k £726.67k £701.85k £577.87k £502.79k
Income from government contracts £258.86k £386.61k N/A £92.09k £92.09k
Income from government grants £45.42k £34.35k £300.52k £59.48k £69.71k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.67k £330 £9.27k £3.09k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £71.28k £74.66k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £552.50k £706.28k £535.36k £564.55k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £66.64k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £588.95k £721.86k £692.67k £565.29k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.98k £4.81k £9.18k £12.58k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.94k £0 £3.99k £3.64k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A