AFRICAN MANDE UNION LIMITED

Charity number: 1100654
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £40.70k £49.13k £36.20k £9.85k £21.00k
Total expenditure £27.55k £27.47k £22.22k £7.23k £21.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A