TOWNLEY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1100947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 January 2017 On time Download