TOWNLEY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1100947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £77.02k £81.59k £80.27k £76.06k £80.79k
Total expenditure £73.26k £73.06k £72.39k £69.62k £81.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £32.89k