Trustees TOWNLEY MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 1100947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD TEMPLER TOWNLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Rebecca Roberts | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Cunnington | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Vaughan-Lane | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Humphreys-Davies | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Turnbull-Jones | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Cox | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWNE BROWN | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mark Taylor | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY HANDS | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
RONALD ARTHUR LAWRENCE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLAN COATESWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.