Financial history DAVISON WORTHING YOUTH CONCERT BAND (DWYCB) PARENT'S GROUP

Charity number: 1101955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.12k £6.12k £7.01k £3.67k £4.74k
Total expenditure £12.44k £12.44k £3.96k £2.86k £1.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A