Accounts and annual returns BERINSFIELD AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1101190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 March 2021 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 March 2021 638 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 March 2021 638 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required