Financial history BERINSFIELD AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1101190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £23.20k £27.62k £21.04k £28.01k £16.47k
Total expenditure £22.92k £27.26k £23.62k £21.92k £12.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.98k