POSITIVE AWARENESS

Charity number: 1101860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required