Financial history S.T.A.R.C.H. (SOUTH TYNESIDE ASYLUM SEEKER AND REFUGEE CHURCH HELP)

Charity number: 1100561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.75k £3.60k £2.75k £2.61k £5.25k
Total expenditure £1.40k £2.47k £1.97k £3.24k £3.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A