HEREFORDSHIRE OUTDOOR TRUST

Charity number: 1101608
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 September 2020 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 June 2019 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required