HEREFORDSHIRE OUTDOOR TRUST

Charity number: 1101608
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £1.30k £0 £20.50k £26.07k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £17.03k £26.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A