Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF GRASMERE
Charity number: 1100824
Charity reporting is overdue by 729 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 364 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 364 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 729 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 729 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 25 September 2019 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window