ST PAUL'S (KNIGHTSBRIDGE) FESTIVAL CHOIR

Charity number: 1104473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 18 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 17 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required