ST PAUL'S (KNIGHTSBRIDGE) FESTIVAL CHOIR

Charity number: 1104473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £22.05k £27.30k £21.75k £23.76k £15.16k
Total expenditure £25.80k £25.55k £27.49k £24.82k £8.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A