ADVANCE HE

Charity number: 1101607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £12.17m £9.33m £15.26m £15.55m £14.42m
Total expenditure £12.83m £10.00m £13.05m £17.03m £12.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £901.00k N/A
Income from government grants £7.83m £965.00k £913.00k £901.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £2.65m £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.83m £965.00k £913.00k £15.50m £13.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.00k £31.00k £32.00k £48.00k £54.00k
Income - Other £4.29m £8.33m £11.66m £0 £888.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £2.65m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.83m £10.00m £13.05m £17.03m £12.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £87.00k £55.00k £50.00k £34.00k £34.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0