ADVANCE HE

Charity number: 1101607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annette Hay Trustee 01 July 2021
BELGRADE THEATRE TRUST (COVENTRY) LIMITED Received: On time
Saad Qureshi Trustee 18 January 2019 None on record
Paul Woodgates Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Geoffrey Mark Layer Trustee 18 November 2015
WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Professor Helen Higson Trustee 30 November 2018 None on record
Professor David Sadler Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Rose Wangen-Jones Trustee 30 November 2018 None on record
Christopher Mark Sayers Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR JANICE MARGARET KAY Trustee None on record
Janet Legrand Trustee 01 July 2021
HAMPSHIRE GIRLS' AND BOYS' HOME Received: On time
CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHILDREN'S SOCIETY Received: On time
Prof Nigel Seaton Trustee 31 March 2018 None on record
Professor Helen O'Sullivan-Heritage Trustee 30 November 2018 None on record
Professor Quintin McKellar Trustee 20 August 2021 None on record
Heather Francis Trustee 01 July 2021
WAR CHILD Received: On time
Stephen Marston Chair 31 March 2018 None on record