Financial history DEDDINGTON WINDMILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1101528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £31.10k £35.60k £36.70k £44.37k £54.15k
Total expenditure £26.18k £30.08k £31.36k £38.06k £36.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £31.73k £29.94k