NORTHERN ACADEMY OF PERFORMING ARTS

Charity number: 1101368
Charity reporting is overdue by 1621 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 16 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Annual return 16 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 844 days
Accounts and TAR 16 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 844 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1256 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1256 days
Annual return 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1621 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1621 days