NEW LIFE CHURCH OF WEST YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1104854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £2.72k £2.45k £2.34k £2.30k £1.85k
Total expenditure £2.69k £2.44k £2.30k £2.25k £1.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A