Financial history CAMPAIGN FOR BETTER TRANSPORT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1101929
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £629.39k £625.82k £573.72k £358.87k £517.14k
Total expenditure £671.24k £579.73k £630.48k £425.85k £311.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £10.00k N/A N/A £22.50k
Income from government grants £26.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £415.09k £367.72k £328.41k N/A £428.66k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £214.26k £258.10k £245.31k N/A £77.40k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £46 £0 £2 N/A £20
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £11.06k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £602.29k £517.58k £509.79k N/A £276.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £68.94k £62.15k £120.69k N/A £35.34k
Expenditure - Governance £3.81k £4.44k £0 N/A £399
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0