Dogfen lywodraethu NOBLE TREE FOUNDATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 APR 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 JAN 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY DECLARING WORLDWIDE THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST; AND 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WORLDWIDE IN SUCH SUBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE 3.1.3 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.