THE FRIENDS OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH HOPE BAGOT

Charity number: 1101421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £1.18k £1.57k £846 £1.34k £871
Total expenditure £1.18k £1.43k £1.00k £1.00k £625
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A