THAMES21 LIMITED

Charity number: 1103997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 December 2016 On time Download