THAMES21 LIMITED

Charity number: 1103997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £2.02m £2.31m £1.92m £1.53m £1.28m
Total expenditure £2.02m £2.30m £1.90m £1.53m £1.26m
Income from government contracts £6.44k £0 N/A N/A £367.81k
Income from government grants £326.48k £295.52k £296.04k £448.96k £12.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £370.24k £0 £60.00k £436.40k £503.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.65m £1.74m £1.86m £1.08m £748.17k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.94k £1.66k £276 £337 £456
Income - Other £0 £571.75k £0 £13.81k £24.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £60.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.00m £2.27m £1.87m £1.50m £1.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.37k £25.72k £25.47k £25.99k £25.94k
Expenditure - Governance £10.39k £15.37k £10.02k £9.00k £12.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £2.24k £0 £483 £1.44k