Financial history ST MICHAEL'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £92.53k £71.90k £81.26k £92.33k £88.43k
Total expenditure £77.44k £80.14k £86.81k £82.64k £92.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £67.84k N/A
Income from government grants £80.73k £49.11k £58.04k £1.64k £400