Accounts and annual returns THE TREDEGAR HOUSE FOLK FESTIVAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1103628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 May 2021 282 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required