Financial history MAKER WITH RAME COMMUNITY BUS SERVICE

Charity number: 1103104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £13.59k £11.43k £11.85k £7.23k £5.98k
Total expenditure £5.80k £5.45k £8.95k £4.86k £3.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.38k £1.69k £1.50k N/A N/A