Trustees LEEDS IRISH ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John O'Dwyer Trustee 28 March 2018
None on record
Dr Patrick Bourne Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record
SEAN STOWELL Trustee 24 November 2015
None on record
TARA MCSTAY Trustee 16 May 2013
None on record
OLIVER JAMES ENGLEY Trustee 03 May 2013
None on record
KIERON MULLOY Trustee
None on record
JO HEYWORTH Trustee
None on record