LATHBURY INSTITUTE OR HALL

Charity number: 1101742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY McGUIRE Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
SARA HARPER Trustee
BURY ST EDMUNDS ECUMENICAL CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
THE ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL CENTRE Received: On time
REV JULIA CORINNE MANN Trustee 23 October 2012
SAXHAM TRUST Received: On time
AIRSHAFT TRUST Received: On time
Andrew Catton Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Canon Tim Jones Trustee 25 April 2018
EASTERN REGION MINISTRY COURSE Received: On time
SALLY PETTITT Trustee 06 April 2016 None on record
Hugh Graham Belsey Trustee
THE CONSTABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE EMERY WALKER TRUST Received: On time
REVEREND CANON MARK NEWBY HAWORTH Chair 02 July 2013
THE ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL CENTRE Received: On time
Janet Catton Trustee 21 September 2016
THE ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL CENTRE Received: On time
JANE HOWLETT Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
ADRIAN DAVID MANN Trustee
BURY ST EDMUNDS ECUMENICAL CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
SAXHAM TRUST Received: On time
THE ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL CENTRE Received: On time
AIRSHAFT TRUST Received: On time
Laura Selman Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
JANET ANNE HAYWARD Trustee 06 November 2011 None on record
Matt Selman Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record